Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB365 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 365
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2013; February 11, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 February 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; February 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expedited credentialing for certain podiatrists
 providing services under a managed care plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1452, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. EXPEDITED CREDENTIALING PROCESS
 FOR CERTAIN PODIATRISTS
 Sec. 1452.151.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Applicant podiatrist" means a podiatrist
 applying for expedited credentialing under this subchapter.
 (2)  "Enrollee" means an individual who is eligible to
 receive health care services under a managed care plan.
 (3)  "Health care provider" means:
 (A)  an individual who is licensed, certified, or
 otherwise authorized to provide health care services in this state;
 or
 (B)  a hospital, emergency clinic, outpatient
 clinic, or other facility providing health care services.
 (4)  "Managed care plan" means a health benefit plan
 under which health care services are provided to enrollees through
 contracts with health care providers and that requires enrollees to
 use participating providers or that provides a different level of
 coverage for enrollees who use participating providers. The term
 includes a health benefit plan issued by:
 (A)  a health maintenance organization;
 (B)  a preferred provider benefit plan issuer; or
 (C)  any other entity that issues a health benefit
 plan, including an insurance company.
 (5)  "Participating provider" means a health care
 provider who has contracted with a health benefit plan issuer to
 provide services to enrollees.
 (6)  "Professional practice" means a business entity
 that is owned by one or more podiatrists or physicians.
 Sec. 1452.152.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to a podiatrist who joins an established professional practice that
 has a current contract in force with a managed care plan.
 Sec. 1452.153.  ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS. To qualify for
 expedited credentialing under this subchapter and payment under
 Section 1452.154, an applicant podiatrist must:
 (1)  be licensed in this state by, and in good standing
 with, the Texas State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners;
 (2)  submit all documentation and other information
 required by the issuer of the managed care plan as necessary to
 enable the issuer to begin the credentialing process required by
 the issuer to include a podiatrist in the issuer's health benefit
 plan network; and
 (3)  agree to comply with the terms of the managed care
 plan's participating provider contract currently in force with the
 applicant podiatrist's established professional practice.
 Sec. 1452.154.  PAYMENT OF APPLICANT PODIATRIST DURING
 CREDENTIALING PROCESS. On submission by the applicant podiatrist
 of the information required by the managed care plan issuer under
 Section 1452.153(2), and for payment purposes only, the issuer
 shall treat the applicant podiatrist as if the podiatrist were a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan network when the
 applicant podiatrist provides services to the managed care plan's
 enrollees, including:
 (1)  authorizing the applicant podiatrist to collect
 copayments from the enrollees; and
 (2)  making payments to the applicant podiatrist.
 Sec. 1452.155.  DIRECTORY ENTRIES.  Pending the approval of
 an application submitted under Section 1452.154, the managed care
 plan may exclude the applicant podiatrist from the managed care
 plan's directory of participating podiatrists, the managed care
 plan's website listing of participating podiatrists, or any other
 listing of participating podiatrists.
 Sec. 1452.156.  EFFECT OF FAILURE TO MEET CREDENTIALING
 REQUIREMENTS. If, on completion of the credentialing process, the
 managed care plan issuer determines that the applicant podiatrist
 does not meet the issuer's credentialing requirements:
 (1)  the managed care plan issuer may recover from the
 applicant podiatrist or the podiatrist's professional practice an
 amount equal to the difference between payments for in-network
 benefits and out-of-network benefits; and
 (2)  the applicant podiatrist or the podiatrist's
 professional practice may retain any copayments collected or in the
 process of being collected as of the date of the issuer's
 determination.
 Sec. 1452.157.  ENROLLEE HELD HARMLESS. An enrollee in the
 managed care plan is not responsible and shall be held harmless for
 the difference between in-network copayments paid by the enrollee
 to a podiatrist who is determined to be ineligible under Section
 1452.156 and the managed care plan's charges for out-of-network
 services. The podiatrist and the podiatrist's professional
 practice may not charge the enrollee for any portion of the
 podiatrist's fee that is not paid or reimbursed by the enrollee's
 managed care plan.
 Sec.  1452.158.  LIMITATION ON MANAGED CARE ISSUER
 LIABILITY.  A managed care plan issuer that complies with this
 subchapter is not subject to liability for damages arising out of or
 in connection with, directly or indirectly, the payment by the
 issuer of an applicant podiatrist as if the podiatrist were a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan network.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to credentialing of a podiatrist under a contract entered into or
 renewed by a professional practice and an issuer of a managed care
 plan on or after the effective date of this Act. A contract entered
 into or renewed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *