Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB395 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 395
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 18, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 395 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fines and court costs imposed on a child in a criminal
 case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 42.15, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (d), (e),
 and (f) to read as follows:
 (b)  Subject to Subsections [Subsection] (c) and (d), when
 imposing a fine and costs, a court may direct a defendant:
 (1)  to pay the entire fine and costs when sentence is
 pronounced;
 (2)  to pay the entire fine and costs at some later
 date; or
 (3)  to pay a specified portion of the fine and costs at
 designated intervals.
 (d)  A judge may allow a defendant who is a child, as defined
 by Article 45.058(h), to elect at the time of conviction, as defined
 by Section 133.101, Local Government Code, to discharge the fine
 and costs by:
 (1)  performing community service or receiving
 tutoring under Article 45.0492, as added by Chapter 227 (H.B. 350),
 Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011; or
 (2)  paying the fine and costs in a manner described by
 Subsection (b).
 (e)  The election under Subsection (d) must be made in
 writing, signed by the defendant, and, if present, signed by the
 defendant's parent, guardian, or managing conservator.  The court
 shall maintain the written election as a record of the court and
 provide a copy to the defendant.
 (f)  The requirement under Article 45.0492(a), as added by
 Chapter 227 (H.B. 350), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, that an offense occur in a building or on the grounds
 of the primary or secondary school at which the defendant was
 enrolled at the time of the offense does not apply to the
 performance of community service or the receipt of tutoring to
 discharge a fine or costs under Subsection (d)(1).
 SECTION 2.  Article 43.091, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 43.091.  WAIVER OF PAYMENT OF FINES AND COSTS FOR
 INDIGENT DEFENDANTS AND CHILDREN.  A court may waive payment of a
 fine or cost imposed on a defendant who defaults in payment if the
 court determines that:
 (1)  the defendant is indigent or was, at the time the
 offense was committed, a child as defined by Article 45.058(h); and
 (2)  each alternative method of discharging the fine or
 cost under Article 43.09 or 42.15 would impose an undue hardship on
 the defendant.
 SECTION 3.  Article 45.041, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-3),
 (b-4), and (b-5) to read as follows:
 (b)  Subject to Subsections [Subsection] (b-2) and (b-3),
 the justice or judge may direct the defendant:
 (1)  to pay:
 (A)  the entire fine and costs when sentence is
 pronounced;
 (B)  the entire fine and costs at some later date;
 or
 (C)  a specified portion of the fine and costs at
 designated intervals;
 (2)  if applicable, to make restitution to any victim
 of the offense; and
 (3)  to satisfy any other sanction authorized by law.
 (b-3)  A judge may allow a defendant who is a child, as
 defined by Article 45.058(h), to elect at the time of conviction, as
 defined by Section 133.101, Local Government Code, to discharge the
 fine and costs by:
 (1)  performing community service or receiving
 tutoring under Article 45.0492, as added by Chapter 227 (H.B. 350),
 Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011; or
 (2)  paying the fine and costs in a manner described by
 Subsection (b).
 (b-4)  The election under Subsection (b-3) must be made in
 writing, signed by the defendant, and, if present, signed by the
 defendant's parent, guardian, or managing conservator. The court
 shall maintain the written election as a record of the court and
 provide a copy to the defendant.
 (b-5)  The requirement under Article 45.0492(a), as added by
 Chapter 227 (H.B. 350), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, that an offense occur in a building or on the grounds
 of the primary or secondary school at which the defendant was
 enrolled at the time of the offense does not apply to the
 performance of community service or the receipt of tutoring to
 discharge a fine or costs under Subsection (b-3)(1).
 SECTION 4.  Article 45.0491, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 45.0491.  WAIVER OF PAYMENT OF FINES AND COSTS FOR
 INDIGENT DEFENDANTS AND CHILDREN. A municipal court, regardless of
 whether the court is a court of record, or a justice court may waive
 payment of a fine or costs imposed on a defendant who defaults in
 payment if the court determines that:
 (1)  the defendant is indigent or was, at the time the
 offense was committed, a child as defined by Article 45.058(h); and
 (2)  discharging the fine and costs under Article
 45.049 or as otherwise authorized by this chapter would impose an
 undue hardship on the defendant.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Articles 42.15 and 45.041, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as amended by this Act, apply only to a sentencing
 proceeding that commences on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 (b)  Articles 43.091 and 45.0491, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as amended by this Act, apply to a sentencing proceeding
 that commences before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *