Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB414 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 14, 2013      TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB414 by Ellis (Relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs.), As Engrossed   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB414, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 14, 2013





  TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB414 by Ellis (Relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB414 by Ellis (Relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education 

 Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB414 by Ellis (Relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs.), As Engrossed

SB414 by Ellis (Relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs.), As Engrossed

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB414, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB414, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2015.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0    


2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromOther Funds Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2013   2014 ($150,000) 2.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0   2017 $0 0.0   2018 $0 0.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromOther Funds Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2013   2014 ($150,000) 2.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0   2017 $0 0.0   2018 $0 0.0  


2014 ($150,000) 2.0
2015 $0 0.0
2016 $0 0.0
2017 $0 0.0
2018 $0 0.0

Fiscal Analysis

The provisions of the bill require the Higher Education Coordinating Board (Board) to conduct a study of regional workforce needs in Texas to determine the regions of the state that would benefit from authorization of baccalaureate degree programs at public community colleges. It would also require the Board to establish appropriate metrics for determining whether a public community college should offer those degree programs. The bill also requires the use of existing funds to conduct the study. The Board shall submit by August 1, 2014, to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education the results of its study and recommendation for legislative or other action. The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.

The provisions of the bill require the Higher Education Coordinating Board (Board) to conduct a study of regional workforce needs in Texas to determine the regions of the state that would benefit from authorization of baccalaureate degree programs at public community colleges. It would also require the Board to establish appropriate metrics for determining whether a public community college should offer those degree programs. The bill also requires the use of existing funds to conduct the study.

The Board shall submit by August 1, 2014, to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education the results of its study and recommendation for legislative or other action.

The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.

Methodology

 Based on information provided by the Higher Education Coordinating Board (Board), two Full-time Equivalent (FTEs) would be needed to implement provisions of the bill.  One FTE would directly work under the Workforce, Academic Affairs and Research Division and one FTE would be under the Planning and Accountability Division. The staff members would complete the 26 regional workforce analyses and simultaneously work with stakeholder committee to develop and test metrics. In addition, the staff would complete the institution and program specific analyses which could be anywhere between 30-80 analyses.   It is estimated that the costs would total $150,000 if conducted by the Board internally or estimated to be an equal amount if the Board enters into a contract externally to conduct the study. Based on information provided by the Board, it is anticipated that the Board would use Higher Education Policy Institute Other Funds to conduct the study.

Based on information provided by the Higher Education Coordinating Board (Board), two Full-time Equivalent (FTEs) would be needed to implement provisions of the bill.  One FTE would directly work under the Workforce, Academic Affairs and Research Division and one FTE would be under the Planning and Accountability Division. The staff members would complete the 26 regional workforce analyses and simultaneously work with stakeholder committee to develop and test metrics. In addition, the staff would complete the institution and program specific analyses which could be anywhere between 30-80 analyses.

 

It is estimated that the costs would total $150,000 if conducted by the Board internally or estimated to be an equal amount if the Board enters into a contract externally to conduct the study. Based on information provided by the Board, it is anticipated that the Board would use Higher Education Policy Institute Other Funds to conduct the study.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

LBB Staff: UP, DE, KK, SK

 UP, DE, KK, SK