By: Ellis, Huffman S.B. No. 414 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2013; February 13, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 6, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 414 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address regional workforce needs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 130.0013 to read as follows: Sec. 130.0013. STUDY AND REPORT; BACCALAUREATE DEGREE PROGRAMS AUTHORITY. (a) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall conduct a study of regional workforce needs in this state to determine the regions of the state that would benefit from the authorization of baccalaureate degree programs at public junior colleges serving the region and appropriate metrics for determining whether a public junior college should offer those degree programs. In conducting its study, the coordinating board shall consult with at least one representative of each of the following: (1) four-year institutions of higher education; (2) two-year institutions of higher education; (3) regional businesses; (4) professional associations; and (5) any other entity the commissioner of higher education considers appropriate. (b) In conducting its study under this section, the coordinating board shall consider the following factors in regard to a public junior college: (1) the need for the baccalaureate degree program in the region served by the public junior college; (2) how the degree program would complement or conflict with the other programs and course offerings of the public junior college; (3) whether the degree program would unnecessarily duplicate a degree program offered by other institutions of higher education; (4) whether an institution of higher education located in the same region as the public junior college has the capacity to offer the degree program; (5) the ability of the public junior college to support the degree program, including the adequacy of the public junior college's facilities, faculty, administration, libraries, and other resources; (6) the feasibility of the public junior college offering the degree program in collaboration with a general academic teaching institution under an articulation agreement; (7) the cost of the degree program to students enrolled in the program; (8) the availability and method of state funding to support the degree program; (9) the current licensure and accreditation standards under which the public junior college operates and the processes necessary to offer a baccalaureate degree program; and (10) any other metric the coordinating board considers relevant. (c) Not later than June 1, 2014, the coordinating board shall submit to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education the results of its study under this section and recommendations for legislative or other action. (d) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *