Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB414 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Ellis, Huffman S.B. No. 414
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 6, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 414 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public
 junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address
 regional workforce needs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0013.  STUDY AND REPORT; BACCALAUREATE DEGREE
 PROGRAMS AUTHORITY. (a)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board shall conduct a study of regional workforce needs in this
 state to determine the regions of the state that would benefit from
 the authorization of baccalaureate degree programs at public junior
 colleges serving the region and appropriate metrics for determining
 whether a public junior college should offer those degree programs.
 In conducting its study, the coordinating board shall consult with
 at least one representative of each of the following:
 (1)  four-year institutions of higher education;
 (2)  two-year institutions of higher education;
 (3)  regional businesses;
 (4)  professional associations; and
 (5)  any other entity the commissioner of higher
 education considers appropriate.
 (b)  In conducting its study under this section, the
 coordinating board shall consider the following factors in regard
 to a public junior college:
 (1)  the need for the baccalaureate degree program in
 the region served by the public junior college;
 (2)  how the degree program would complement or
 conflict with the other programs and course offerings of the public
 junior college;
 (3)  whether the degree program would unnecessarily
 duplicate a degree program offered by other institutions of higher
 education;
 (4)  whether an institution of higher education located
 in the same region as the public junior college has the capacity to
 offer the degree program;
 (5)  the ability of the public junior college to
 support the degree program, including the adequacy of the public
 junior college's facilities, faculty, administration, libraries,
 and other resources;
 (6)  the feasibility of the public junior college
 offering the degree program in collaboration with a general
 academic teaching institution under an articulation agreement;
 (7)  the cost of the degree program to students
 enrolled in the program;
 (8)  the availability and method of state funding to
 support the degree program;
 (9)  the current licensure and accreditation standards
 under which the public junior college operates and the processes
 necessary to offer a baccalaureate degree program; and
 (10)  any other metric the coordinating board considers
 relevant.
 (c)  Not later than June 1, 2014, the coordinating board
 shall submit to each legislative standing committee with primary
 jurisdiction over higher education the results of its study under
 this section and recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *