Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB414 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 414


 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report regarding authorizing certain public
 junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs to address
 regional workforce needs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0013.  STUDY AND REPORT; BACCALAUREATE DEGREE
 PROGRAMS AUTHORITY. (a)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board shall, using existing funds, conduct a study of regional
 workforce needs in this state to determine the regions of the state
 that would benefit from the authorization of baccalaureate degree
 programs in the field of nursing and in the field of applied
 sciences at public junior colleges serving the region and
 appropriate metrics for determining whether a public junior college
 should offer those degree programs.  In conducting its study, the
 coordinating board shall consult with at least one representative
 of each of the following:
 (1)  four-year institutions of higher education;
 (2)  two-year institutions of higher education;
 (3)  regional businesses;
 (4)  professional associations; and
 (5)  any other entity the commissioner of higher
 education considers appropriate.
 (b)  Not later than August 1, 2014, the coordinating board
 shall submit to each legislative standing committee with primary
 jurisdiction over higher education the results of its study under
 this section and recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 414 passed the Senate on
 May 9, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 414 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 5, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor