Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB435 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 435     83R4314 MEW-F   By: Duncan         Education         2/28/2013         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 435
83R4314 MEW-F By: Duncan
 Education
 2/28/2013
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 435

83R4314 MEW-F

By: Duncan

 

Education

 

2/28/2013

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, a school district is not required to pay a student's tuition or other associated costs for taking a course that provides college credit (e.g., dual credit, International Baccalaureate, or advanced placement courses). However, this provision is set to expire September 1, 2013. As filed, S.B. 435 moves the expiration date of the provision to September 1, 2015.   As proposed, S.B. 435 amends current law relating to the payment of tuition for public high school students who participate in college credit programs.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 28.009(a-2), Education Code, to provide that this subsection, providing that a school district is not required to pay a student's tuition or other associated costs for taking a course under Section 28.009 (College Credit Program), expires September 1, 2015, rather than September 1, 2013.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or August 31, 2013. 

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, a school district is not required to pay a student's tuition or other associated costs for taking a course that provides college credit (e.g., dual credit, International Baccalaureate, or advanced placement courses). However, this provision is set to expire September 1, 2013. As filed, S.B. 435 moves the expiration date of the provision to September 1, 2015.

 

As proposed, S.B. 435 amends current law relating to the payment of tuition for public high school students who participate in college credit programs.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 28.009(a-2), Education Code, to provide that this subsection, providing that a school district is not required to pay a student's tuition or other associated costs for taking a course under Section 28.009 (College Credit Program), expires September 1, 2015, rather than September 1, 2013.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or August 31, 2013.