Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB435 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 435
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 435 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of tuition for public high school students
 who participate in college credit programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a-2), Section 28.009, Education
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  A school district is not required to pay a student's
 tuition or other associated costs for taking a course under this
 section.  [This subsection expires September 1, 2013.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect August 31, 2013.
 * * * * *