Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB439 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 439
 (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Weatherford College District service area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.209, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 130.209.  WEATHERFORD COLLEGE DISTRICT SERVICE AREA.
 The service area of the Weatherford College District includes the
 territory within Hood, Parker, Wise, Jack, and Palo Pinto counties.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *