Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini, West S.B. No. 44
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 28, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 23, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas  8, Nays 0;
 April 23, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 44 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maintaining and reporting certain information
 regarding certain child abuse or neglect cases and the provision of
 mental health services for children in those cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 261.004, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall report the following information:
 (1)  the number of initial phone calls received by the
 department alleging abuse and neglect;
 (2)  the number of children reported to the department
 as having been abused and neglected;
 (3)  the number of reports received by the department
 alleging abuse or neglect and assigned by the department for
 investigation;
 (4)  of the children to whom Subdivision (2) applies:
 (A)  the number for whom the report was
 substantiated;
 (B)  the number for whom the report was
 unsubstantiated;
 (C)  the number for whom the report was determined
 to be false;
 (D)  the number who did not receive services from
 the department under a state or federal program;
 (E)  the number who received services, including
 preventative services, from the department under a state or federal
 program; and
 (F)  the number who were removed from the child's
 home during the preceding year;
 (5)  the number of families in which the child was not
 removed, but the child or family received services from the
 department;
 (6)  the number of children who died during the
 preceding year as a result of child abuse or neglect;
 (7)  of the children to whom Subdivision (6) applies,
 the number who were in foster care at the time of death;
 (8)  the number of child protective services workers
 responsible for report intake, assessment, or investigation;
 (9)  the response time by the department with respect
 to conducting an initial investigation of a report of child abuse or
 neglect;
 (10)  the response time by the department with respect
 to commencing services to families and children for whom an
 allegation of abuse or neglect has been made;
 (11)  the number of children who were returned to their
 families or who received family preservation services and who,
 before the fifth anniversary of the date of return or receipt, were
 the victims of substantiated reports of child abuse or neglect,
 including abuse or neglect resulting in the death of the child;
 (12)  the number of cases pursued by the department in
 each stage of the judicial process, including civil and criminal
 proceedings and the results of each proceeding; [and]
 (13)  the number of children for whom a person was
 appointed by the court to represent the best interests of the child
 and the average number of out-of-court contacts between the person
 and the child; and
 (14)  the number of children who suffer from a mental
 illness, as defined by Section 571.003, Health and Safety Code, and
 for whom the department is appointed managing conservator because a
 person voluntarily relinquished possession of the child solely to
 obtain mental health services for the child.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 262, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. RELINQUISHING CHILD TO OBTAIN CERTAIN SERVICES
 Sec. 262.351.  JOINT MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHILD.
 Before a person relinquishes possession of a child who suffers from
 a serious mental illness in order to obtain mental health services
 for the child, the Department of Family and Protective Services
 must notify the person relinquishing possession of the child of the
 option of seeking a court order for joint managing conservatorship
 of the child with the department if that arrangement is in the best
 interest of the child.
 Sec. 262.352.  STUDY TO DEVELOP ALTERNATIVES TO
 RELINQUISHMENT OF PARENTAL RIGHTS TO OBTAIN MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES.
 (a)  The Department of Family and Protective Services and the
 Department of State Health Services shall jointly study, develop,
 and implement changes necessary to prevent the practice of parents
 relinquishing parental rights of children with serious mental
 illness and placement in the conservatorship of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services solely to obtain mental health
 services for the child.
 (b)  As part of the study under Subsection (a), the
 Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of
 State Health Services shall consider the advantages of providing
 mental health services using temporary residential treatment and
 intensive community-based services options, including:
 (1)  joint managing conservatorship of the child by the
 Department of Family and Protective Services and the child's
 parent;
 (2)  the Youth Empowerment Services waiver program;
 (3)  systems of care services;
 (4)  emergency respite services; and
 (5)  diversion residential treatment center services.
 (c)  Not later than September 30, 2014, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health
 Services shall file a report with the legislature and the Council on
 Children and Families on the results of the study required by
 Subsection (b). The report must include:
 (1)  any statutory changes needed to prevent the
 relinquishment of parental rights;
 (2)  each option to prevent relinquishment of parental
 rights that was considered during the study;
 (3)  each option that was selected for implementation;
 (4)  the implementation status of each option; and
 (5)  the number of children and families that are
 affected by the implementation of each option.
 (d)  Not later than September 30 of each even-numbered year
 after the date the report is filed under Subsection (c), the
 Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of
 State Health Services shall update the report.
 SECTION 3.  Section 531.803, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The council shall:
 (1)  analyze the biennial legislative appropriations
 requests of members of the council for services provided to
 children and their families and identify appropriations that,
 through the coordination of members of the council, could be
 modified in the next legislative appropriation request to eliminate
 waste or increase available services and, not later than May 1 of
 each even-numbered year, prepare a report recommending those
 modifications for consideration during the development of the next
 biennial legislative appropriations request;
 (2)  investigate opportunities to increase flexible
 funding for health, education, and human services provided to
 children and their families;
 (3)  identify methods to remove barriers to local
 coordination of health, education, and human services provided to
 children and their families;
 (4)  identify methods to ensure that children and youth
 receive appropriate assessment, diagnoses, and intervention
 services;
 (5)  develop methods to prevent unnecessary parental
 relinquishment of custody of children;
 (6)  prioritize assisting children in family settings
 rather than institutional settings;
 (7)  make recommendations to the executive
 commissioner to eliminate the practice of including in the central
 registry of reported cases of child abuse or neglect the name of a
 person who relinquishes possession of the person's child to the
 state solely for the purpose of obtaining mental health services
 for the child;
 (8)  make recommendations about family involvement in
 the provision and planning of health, education, and human services
 for a child, including family partner and liaison models; and
 (9) [(8)]  identify technological methods to ensure
 the efficient and timely transfer of information among state
 agencies providing health, education, and human services to
 children and their families.
 (a-1)  The executive commissioner shall review the council's
 recommendations under Subsection (a)(7) and implement any changes
 necessary to ensure that the central registry of reported cases of
 child abuse or neglect does not include the name of a person who
 relinquishes possession of the person's child to the state solely
 for the purpose of obtaining mental health services for the child.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *