Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB45 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 45
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 28, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 2, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 45 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of employment assistance and supported
 employment to certain Medicaid waiver program participants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.075.  EMPLOYMENT ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORTED
 EMPLOYMENT. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Employment assistance" means assistance provided
 to an individual to help the individual locate paid employment in
 the community.  Employment assistance includes:
 (A)  identifying an individual's employment
 preferences, job skills, and requirements for a work setting and
 work conditions;
 (B)  locating prospective employers offering
 employment compatible with an individual's identified preferences,
 skills, and requirements; and
 (C)  contacting a prospective employer on behalf
 of an individual and negotiating the individual's employment.
 (2)  "Supported employment" means assistance provided,
 in order to sustain paid employment, to an individual who, because
 of a disability, requires intensive, ongoing support to be
 self-employed, work from home, or perform in a work setting at which
 individuals without disabilities are employed.  Supported
 employment includes adaptations, supervision, and training related
 to an individual's diagnosis.
 (b)  This section applies only to the following medical
 assistance waiver programs:
 (1)  the community based alternatives program;
 (2)  the community living assistance and support
 services program;
 (3)  the deaf-blind with multiple disabilities
 program;
 (4)  the home and community-based services program;
 (5)  the medically dependent children program;
 (6)  the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program;
 (7)  the Texas home living program; and
 (8)  the youth empowerment services program.
 (c)  The department shall provide employment assistance and
 supported employment to participants in the waiver programs
 identified in Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall apply for
 any waiver or other authorization necessary to implement this Act.
 The commission may delay implementing this Act until the waiver or
 authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *