Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB466 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa, Nichols S.B. No. 466
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
 to participate in certain federal transportation programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.6035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.6035.  AUTHORIZATION TO PARTICIPATE IN CERTAIN
 FEDERAL TRANSPORTATION PROGRAMS. (a)  The department may assume
 responsibilities of the United States Department of Transportation
 with respect to duties under the National Environmental Policy Act
 of 1969 (42 U.S.C. Section 4321 et seq.) and with respect to duties
 under other federal environmental laws. The department may:
 (1)  assume responsibilities under 23 U.S.C. Sections
 326 and 327; and
 (2)  enter into one or more agreements, including
 memoranda of understanding, with the United States secretary of
 transportation related to:
 (A)  designating categorical exclusions from
 federally required environmental assessments or impact statements
 for highway projects as provided by 23 U.S.C. Section 326; or
 (B)  the federal surface transportation project
 delivery program for the delivery of transportation projects,
 including highway, railroad, public transportation, and multimodal
 projects, as provided by 23 U.S.C. Section 327.
 (b)  The commission may adopt rules to implement this section
 and may adopt relevant federal environmental standards as the
 standards for this state for a program described by Subsection (a).
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), sovereign
 immunity to suit in federal court and from liability is waived and
 abolished with regard to the compliance, discharge, or enforcement
 of a responsibility assumed by the department under this section.
 (d)  Subsection (c) does not create liability for the
 department that exceeds the liability created under 23 U.S.C.
 Section 326(c)(3) or 327(d).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *