Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB473 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 473
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 February 27, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 February 27, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 473 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of temporary common worker employers;
 providing a criminal penalty; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 7, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 247 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 247. MUNICIPAL AND COUNTY AUTHORITY TO REGULATE TEMPORARY
 COMMON WORKER EMPLOYERS
 Sec. 247.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Common worker" means an individual who performs
 labor involving physical tasks that do not require:
 (A)  a particular skill;
 (B)  training in a particular occupation, craft,
 or trade; or
 (C)  practical knowledge of the principles or
 processes of an art, science, craft, or trade.
 (2)  "Labor hall" means a central location maintained
 by a license holder where common workers assemble and are
 dispatched to work for a user of common workers.
 (3)  "Temporary common worker employer" means a person
 who provides common workers to a user of common workers and operates
 a labor hall. The term:
 (A)  includes a temporary common worker agent or
 temporary common worker agency; and
 (B)  does not include:
 (i)  a temporary skilled labor agency;
 (ii)  a staff leasing services company;
 (iii)  an employment counselor;
 (iv)  a talent agency;
 (v)  a labor union hiring hall;
 (vi)  a labor bureau or employment office
 operated by a person for the sole purpose of employing an individual
 for the person's own use; or
 (vii)  an employment service or labor
 training program provided by a governmental entity.
 (4)  "User of common workers" means a person who uses
 the services of a common worker provided by a temporary common
 worker employer.
 Sec. 247.002.  AUTHORITY TO REGULATE. (a)  A municipality
 by ordinance or a county by order may:
 (1)  require that a temporary common worker employer
 obtain a license issued by the municipality or county on a periodic
 basis in order to operate as a temporary common worker employer in
 the municipality or county; and
 (2)  collect a fee for the issuance of a temporary
 common worker employer license.
 (b)  An ordinance adopted by a municipality under this
 chapter applies only inside the municipality's corporate limits.
 (c)  An order adopted by a county applies only to the parts of
 the county outside the corporate limits of a municipality.
 Sec. 247.003.  REGULATION REQUIREMENTS. The regulations
 adopted by a municipality or county under this chapter must:
 (1)  provide that the municipality or county will issue
 a temporary common worker employer license to a person who:
 (A)  meets the application requirements
 established by the municipality or county; and
 (B)  pays the application and registration fees
 set by the municipality or county;
 (2)  provide that a license issued under this chapter
 is not assignable or transferable;
 (3)  require each license holder to maintain and make
 available to a representative of the municipality or county records
 that show for each common worker provided by the license holder to a
 user of common workers:
 (A)  the name and address of the worker;
 (B)  the hours worked by the worker;
 (C)  the places at which the work was performed by
 the worker;
 (D)  the wages paid to the worker; and
 (E)  any deductions made from the wages paid to a
 worker;
 (4)  require each license holder to maintain the
 records described by Subdivision (3) at least until the second
 anniversary of the date on which the worker was last employed by the
 license holder;
 (5)  provide that information received by the
 municipality or county under Subdivision (3):
 (A)  is privileged and confidential and is for the
 exclusive use of the municipality or county; and
 (B)  may not be disclosed to any other person
 except on the entry of a court order requiring disclosure or on the
 written consent of a person under investigation who is the subject
 of the records;
 (6)  require each license holder to post for inspection
 in a location that is in open view to the public on the licensed
 premises:
 (A)  the license for a place of business at which
 the license holder operates as a temporary common worker employer;
 and
 (B)  a notice of any charge permitted under this
 chapter that the license holder may assess against a common worker
 for equipment, tools, transportation, or other work-related
 services;
 (7)  require each license holder that operates a labor
 hall as part of a licensed premises to provide adequate facilities
 for a worker waiting for a job assignment that include:
 (A)  restroom facilities for both men and women;
 (B)  drinking water;
 (C)  sufficient seating; and
 (D)  access to vending refreshments and food; and
 (8)  prohibit each license holder from:
 (A)  charging a common worker for:
 (i)  safety equipment, clothing, or
 accessories required by the nature of the work, either by law,
 custom, or the requirements of the user of common workers;
 (ii)  uniforms, special clothing, or other
 items required as a condition of employment by the user of common
 workers;
 (iii)  the cashing of a check or voucher; or
 (iv)  the receipt by the worker of earned
 wages; or
 (B)  deducting or withholding any amount from the
 earned wages of a common worker except:
 (i)  a deduction required by federal or
 state law; or
 (ii)  a reimbursement for a cash advance
 made to the worker during the same pay period.
 Sec. 247.004.  LICENSE HOLDER AS EMPLOYER. (a)  Each
 license holder under this chapter is the employer of the common
 workers provided by that license holder.
 (b)  A license holder under this chapter may hire, reassign,
 control, direct, and discharge the employees of the license holder.
 Sec. 247.005.  INJUNCTION; CRIMINAL PENALTY.  (a)  A
 municipality or county may bring an action in a district court for
 an injunction to prohibit the violation of a regulation adopted
 under this chapter.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person violates a
 municipal or county regulation adopted under this chapter. An
 offense under this subsection is a Class C misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 92, Labor Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  (a) An administrative proceeding pending under
 Chapter 51, Occupations Code, or Chapter 92, Labor Code, on the
 effective date of this Act related to a violation of Chapter 92,
 Labor Code, as that chapter existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, is dismissed.
 (b)  An administrative penalty assessed by the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation or the executive director of
 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation related to a
 violation of Chapter 92, Labor Code, as that chapter existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, may be collected
 as provided by Chapter 51, Occupations Code.
 (c)  The changes in law made by this Act do not affect the
 pending prosecution of an offense under Chapter 92, Labor Code, as
 that chapter existed immediately before the effective date of this
 Act. An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this subsection, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 (d)  The Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation shall
 return to a person who holds a valid license under Chapter 92, Labor
 Code, as that chapter existed immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, a prorated portion of the fee paid to the department
 for the issuance or renewal of the license.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *