Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB490 Enrolled / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 490         By: Seliger         Higher Education         7/9/2013         Enrolled    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 490
 By: Seliger
 Higher Education
 7/9/2013
 Enrolled

Senate Research Center

S.B. 490

 

By: Seliger

 

Higher Education

 

7/9/2013

 

Enrolled

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   In 2005, the 79th Legislature passed H.B. 1172, which made changes to the eligibility requirements for the Tuition Equalization Grant (TEG) program.   H.B. 1172 created two separate categories of eligible TEG recipients: students who received their initial award before September 1, 2005 (the original program), and students who received their initial award on or after September 1, 2005 (the revised program).   S.B. 490 amends current law relating to the expiration of tuition equalization grant requirements for grants awarded before the 2005-2006 academic year.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 61.225, Education Code, by adding Subsections (d) and (e), as follows:   (d) Provides that this section does not apply to the eligibility requirements for tuition equalization grants awarded for an academic year after the 2014-2015 academic year.   (e) Provides that this section expires January 1, 2016.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013.   

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

In 2005, the 79th Legislature passed H.B. 1172, which made changes to the eligibility requirements for the Tuition Equalization Grant (TEG) program.

 

H.B. 1172 created two separate categories of eligible TEG recipients: students who received their initial award before September 1, 2005 (the original program), and students who received their initial award on or after September 1, 2005 (the revised program).

 

S.B. 490 amends current law relating to the expiration of tuition equalization grant requirements for grants awarded before the 2005-2006 academic year.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 61.225, Education Code, by adding Subsections (d) and (e), as follows:

 

(d) Provides that this section does not apply to the eligibility requirements for tuition equalization grants awarded for an academic year after the 2014-2015 academic year.

 

(e) Provides that this section expires January 1, 2016.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013.