Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 504
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1,
 1 present not voting; March 18, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 504 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain schoolchildren be screened
 for abnormal spinal curvature.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 37.001, Health
 and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The board, in cooperation with the Texas Education
 Agency, shall adopt rules requiring each public or private school
 to choose either to participate in the [for the mandatory] spinal
 screening program for [of] children in grades 6 and 9 attending the
 public or private school or to provide information developed by the
 department on abnormal spinal curvature to the parents, managing
 conservators, or guardians of children in grades 6 through 9
 attending the public or private school [schools]. The department
 shall coordinate the spinal screening program with any other
 screening program conducted by the department on those children.
 (c)  The board shall adopt substantive and procedural rules
 necessary to administer screening activities and for the
 development and provision of information on abnormal spinal
 curvature.
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.002.  [COMPLIANCE WITH] SCREENING REQUIREMENTS.
 (a)  If a public or private school requires an [Each] individual
 [required by board rule] to be screened, the individual shall
 undergo approved screening for abnormal spinal curvature.  The
 individual's parent, managing conservator, or guardian may
 substitute professional examinations for the screening.
 (b)  An individual is exempt from screening if screening
 conflicts with the tenets and practices of a recognized church or
 religious denomination of which the individual is an adherent or a
 member. To qualify for the exemption, the individual's parent,
 managing conservator, or guardian must submit to the chief
 administrator on or before the day of the screening procedure an
 affidavit stating the objections to screening. The chief
 administrator must make the information on abnormal spinal
 curvature developed under Section 37.001 available to the exempted
 individual's parent, managing conservator, or guardian.
 (c)  If screening is required, the [The] chief administrator
 of each school shall ensure that each individual admitted to the
 school complies with the screening requirements set by the board or
 submits an affidavit of exemption.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than March 1, 2014, the Department of
 State Health Services shall develop the information required by
 Subsection (b), Section 37.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended
 by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2014-2015
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *