Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB505 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 505
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 2, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 505 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the licensing requirement for certain
 persons who measure or fit orthoses under the supervision of a
 physician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 605, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 605.306 to read as follows:
 Sec. 605.306.  EXEMPTION FOR CERTAIN SUPERVISED PERSONS.
 (a)  This chapter does not apply to a person who measures or fits an
 orthosis under the supervision of a physician practicing under
 Subtitle B.
 (b)  The exemption provided by this section does not apply to
 the measuring and fitting of a custom-fabricated device if the
 measuring and fitting requires substantial clinical judgment as
 determined by the treating physician.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *