Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB518 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife, et al. S.B. No. 518
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 18, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 518 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain brewers and manufacturers to
 sell beer and ale to ultimate consumers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  the state is authorized under the Twenty-first
 Amendment of the United States Constitution to promote the public's
 interest in the fair, efficient, and competitive marketing of beer
 and ale in this state;
 (2)  the United States Supreme Court in Granholm v.
 Heald, 544 U.S. 460 (2005), has recognized that the three-tier
 system of regulating the alcoholic beverage industry is
 unquestionably legitimate;
 (3)  in Granholm, the United States Supreme Court
 further recognized that while the states are entitled to regulate
 the production and sale of liquor within their borders, the right is
 nonetheless subject to the provisions of the Constitution of the
 United States, including the Interstate Commerce Clause, and laws
 regulating the alcoholic beverage industry may not discriminate
 against out-of-state participants or give undue deference to local
 participants and may not ignore other provisions of the
 constitution, including the Supremacy Clause, Commerce Clause, and
 the Privileges and Immunities Clause with its nondiscriminatory
 principles;
 (4)  the state is authorized to promote, market, and
 educate consumers about the emerging small brewing industry;
 (5)  it is in the state's interest to encourage
 entrepreneurial and small business development opportunities in
 the state that will lead to new capital investment in the state,
 create new jobs in the state, and expand the state and local tax
 base; and
 (6)  it is the public policy of the state to exercise
 the police power of the state to protect the welfare, health, peace,
 temperance, and safety of the people of Texas.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 12, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 12.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.052.  SALES BY CERTAIN BREWERS TO CONSUMERS.
 (a)  In addition to the activities authorized by Section 12.01, the
 holder of a brewer's permit whose annual production of ale together
 with the annual production of beer by the holder of a manufacturer's
 license at the same premises does not exceed a total of 225,000
 barrels may sell ale produced on the brewer's premises under the
 permit to ultimate consumers on the brewer's premises for
 responsible consumption on the brewer's premises.
 (b)  The total combined sales of ale to ultimate consumers
 under this section, together with the sales of beer to ultimate
 consumers by the holder of a manufacturer's license under Section
 62.122 at the same premises, may not exceed 5,000 barrels annually.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 62, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 62.122 to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.122.  SALES BY CERTAIN MANUFACTURERS TO CONSUMERS.
 (a)  A manufacturer's licensee whose annual production of beer
 together with the annual production of ale by the holder of a
 brewer's permit at the same premises does not exceed 225,000
 barrels may sell beer produced on the manufacturer's premises under
 the license to ultimate consumers on the manufacturer's premises
 for responsible consumption on the manufacturer's premises.
 (b)  The total combined sales of beer to ultimate consumers
 under this section, together with the sales of ale to ultimate
 consumers by the holder of a brewer's permit under Section 12.052 at
 the same premises, may not exceed 5,000 barrels annually.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 105, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 105.081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.081.  HOURS OF SALE AND CONSUMPTION:  BREWER OR
 MANUFACTURER. (a)  The holder of a brewer's permit may sell, offer
 for sale, and deliver ale or malt liquor and a person may consume
 ale or malt liquor on the brewer's premises:
 (1)  between 8 a.m. and midnight on any day except
 Sunday; and
 (2)  between 10 a.m. and midnight on Sunday.
 (b)  The holder of a manufacturer's license may sell, offer
 for sale, and deliver beer and a person may consume beer on the
 manufacturer's premises:
 (1)  between 8 a.m. and midnight on any day except
 Sunday; and
 (2)  between 10 a.m. and midnight on Sunday.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *