Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB519 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 519
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of autism and other pervasive
 developmental disorders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (1), Section 114.002, Human
 Resources Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Autism and other pervasive developmental
 disorders" means a subclass of mental disorders characterized by
 distortions in the development of multiple basic psychological
 functions that are involved in the development of social skills and
 language, as defined by the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual
 (DSM-5), 5th[, 4th] Edition.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *