Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB521 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton, Campbell, Lucio S.B. No. 521
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 13, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; March 13, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 521 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of and parental approval for a student's
 participation in human sexuality and family planning instruction in
 public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.004, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e-1), (e-2), (e-3), and (i-2) to read as
 follows:
 (e-1)  An entity or individual that performs abortions or an
 affiliate of an entity or individual that performs abortions may
 not provide human sexuality or family planning instruction or
 instructional materials for use in human sexuality or family
 planning instruction in a public school.
 (e-2)  For purposes of Subsection (e-1), "affiliate" means
 an entity or individual that has a legal relationship with another
 entity or individual that is created or governed by at least one
 written instrument that demonstrates:
 (1)  common ownership, management, or control;
 (2)  the existence of a franchise; or
 (3)  the granting or extension of a license or other
 agreement that authorizes the affiliate to use the entity's or
 individual's brand name, trademark, service mark, or other
 registered identification mark.
 (e-3)  Subsection (e-1) does not apply to a hospital:
 (1)  licensed under Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code; or
 (2)  owned and operated by the state.
 (i-2)  Before a student may be provided with human sexuality
 or family planning instruction from an entity or individual other
 than an employee of a school district, the district must obtain the
 written consent of the student's parent or guardian.  A request for
 written consent under this subsection:
 (1)  may not be included with any other notification or
 request for written consent provided to the parent or guardian;
 (2)  must be provided to the parent or guardian not
 later than the 14th day before the date on which the human sexuality
 or family planning instruction begins; and
 (3)  must include the information described by
 Subsection (i)(1) and the name of the entity or individual who will
 provide the instruction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *