Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB531 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 531
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to self-insurance funds established by governmental
 units.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2259.031, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  The governmental unit may purchase reinsurance for a
 risk covered through the fund.
 (d)  Any law, including a regulation, requiring insurance
 may be satisfied by coverage provided through the fund.
 (e)  Any law, including a regulation, requiring a
 certificate of insurance or an insurance agent's signature,
 countersignature, or approval may be satisfied by a certificate of
 coverage issued on behalf of the governmental unit demonstrating
 that coverage is provided through the fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *