LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION March 18, 2013 TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee On Health & Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:SB534 by West (Relating to requiring permanency planning meetings for certain children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB534, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,212,547) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION March 18, 2013 TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee On Health & Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:SB534 by West (Relating to requiring permanency planning meetings for certain children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee On Health & Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: SB534 by West (Relating to requiring permanency planning meetings for certain children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee On Health & Human Services Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee On Health & Human Services Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board SB534 by West (Relating to requiring permanency planning meetings for certain children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced SB534 by West (Relating to requiring permanency planning meetings for certain children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB534, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,212,547) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB534, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($1,212,547) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds 2014 ($361,032) 2015 ($851,515) 2016 ($851,515) 2017 ($851,515) 2018 ($851,515) 2014 ($361,032) 2015 ($851,515) 2016 ($851,515) 2017 ($851,515) 2018 ($851,515) All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable (Cost) fromGR Match For Medicaid758 Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2013 2014 ($353,454) ($7,578) ($134,083) 4.2 2015 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2016 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2017 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2018 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable (Cost) fromGR Match For Medicaid758 Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2013 2014 ($353,454) ($7,578) ($134,083) 4.2 2015 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2016 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2017 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2018 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2014 ($353,454) ($7,578) ($134,083) 4.2 2015 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2016 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2017 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 2018 ($844,667) ($6,848) ($119,582) 12.5 Fiscal Analysis The bill would amend Chapter 263 of the Family Code to require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to hold a permanency planning meeting for children meeting certain criteria at specific intervals. Exemptions are provided. The bill would require DFPS to give notice of each permanency planning meeting to certain related parties. The provisions of the bill would apply only to children placed in temporary managing conservatorship of DFPS on or after September 1, 2013. Methodology DFPS has determined that an estimated 1,376 children each month would require the 9-month permanency planning meeting. Assuming that 50% of children have siblings, the estimated number of newly-required meetings each month would be 688. Since the provisions of the bill only apply to children placed in the temporary managing conservatorship of DFPS on or after September 1, 2013, it is assumed the newly-required meetings would not take place until June 1, 2014. DFPS has indicated a need for 12.2 additional FTEs to complete the 688 additional meetings (includes some support staff), with an additional 0.3 FTEs required at the Health and Human Services Commission. It is assumed these FTEs would be hired beginning May 1, 2014. Salary and fringe benefits associated with the FTEs would total about $261,000 in fiscal year 2014 and $783,000 in fiscal years 2015-2018. Other costs associated with the FTEs would total $233,987 in fiscal year 2014 and $187,713 in fiscal years 2015-2018. DFPS has determined that an estimated 1,376 children each month would require the 9-month permanency planning meeting. Assuming that 50% of children have siblings, the estimated number of newly-required meetings each month would be 688. Since the provisions of the bill only apply to children placed in the temporary managing conservatorship of DFPS on or after September 1, 2013, it is assumed the newly-required meetings would not take place until June 1, 2014. DFPS has indicated a need for 12.2 additional FTEs to complete the 688 additional meetings (includes some support staff), with an additional 0.3 FTEs required at the Health and Human Services Commission. It is assumed these FTEs would be hired beginning May 1, 2014. Salary and fringe benefits associated with the FTEs would total about $261,000 in fiscal year 2014 and $783,000 in fiscal years 2015-2018. Other costs associated with the FTEs would total $233,987 in fiscal year 2014 and $187,713 in fiscal years 2015-2018. Technology DFPS estimates a technology impact of $12,134 per fiscal year (included above) to support the FTEs. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of LBB Staff: UP, CL, MB, SJ, VJC, NB UP, CL, MB, SJ, VJC, NB