Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB563 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 563
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 25, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 563 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 recipients of the Defense Superior Service Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.319 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.319.  DEFENSE SUPERIOR SERVICE MEDAL RECIPIENTS.
 The department shall issue specialty license plates for recipients
 of the Defense Superior Service Medal.  License plates issued under
 this section must include the words "Defense Superior Service
 Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 504.3015,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person applying for a set of license plates under this
 subchapter shall pay the registration fee required under Chapter
 502 and the applicable special plate fee required under this
 section, except that one set of license plates shall be issued under
 Section 504.308, [or] 504.315, or 504.319 without the payment of
 the registration fee.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *