Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB576 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            February 26, 2013      TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee On Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB576 by Duncan (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses, otherwise the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, ZS, JP, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
February 26, 2013





  TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee On Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB576 by Duncan (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee On Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB576 by Duncan (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee On Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee On Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB576 by Duncan (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

SB576 by Duncan (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses, otherwise the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

LBB Staff: UP, CL, ZS, JP, KKR

 UP, CL, ZS, JP, KKR