Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB578 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 578


 AN ACT
 relating to use of countywide polling places for certain elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.004, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If a political subdivision holds an election jointly
 with an election described by Section 43.007(a)(1), (2), (3), or
 (4) and is required to use countywide polling places under Section
 43.007, the governing body of the political subdivision may
 designate as the polling places for any required runoff election
 only the polling places located in the territory or in and near the
 territory of the political subdivision where eligible voters
 reside.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 43.007, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The secretary of state shall implement a program to
 allow each commissioners court participating in the program to
 eliminate county election precinct polling places and establish
 countywide polling places for:
 (1)  each general election for state and county
 officers;
 (2)  each election held on the uniform election date in
 May;
 (3)  each election on a proposed constitutional
 amendment; [and]
 (4)  each primary election and runoff primary election
 if:
 (A)  the county chair or county executive
 committee of each political party participating in a joint primary
 election under Section 172.126 agrees to the use of countywide
 polling places; or
 (B)  the county chair or county executive
 committee of each political party required to nominate candidates
 by primary election agrees to use the same countywide polling
 places; and
 (5)  each election of a political subdivision located
 in the county that is held jointly with an election described by
 Subdivision (1), (2), (3), or (4) [(3)].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 578 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 578 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 23, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor