By: Davis, Campbell S.B. No. 664 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2013; February 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; March 28, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 28, 2013, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the allocation of certain grants from the fund for veterans' assistance. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 434.017, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to read as follows: (c-1) Not later than May 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall: (1) conduct a needs assessment to identify the specific high-priority needs of veterans and the services available to address those needs; (2) determine the grant categories that correspond to the high-priority needs identified under Subdivision (1); and (3) identify any gaps between the needs identified under Subdivision (1) and the services available to address those needs. (c-2) The commission shall incorporate the results of the needs assessment and other determinations under Subsection (c-1) in its process for awarding grants from the fund for veterans' assistance. SECTION 2. Not later than May 1, 2014, the Texas Veterans Commission shall conduct a needs assessment and make other determinations required by Subsection (c-1), Section 434.017, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *