Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB667 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 7, 2013      TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Open Government      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB667 by Seliger (Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB667, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($200,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 7, 2013





  TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Open Government      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB667 by Seliger (Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Open Government
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB667 by Seliger (Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Open Government 

 Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Open Government 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB667 by Seliger (Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.), As Introduced

SB667 by Seliger (Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB667, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($200,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB667, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($200,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2015.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2014 ($200,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0    


2014 ($200,000)
2015 $0
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2014 ($200,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2014 ($200,000)   2015 $0   2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0  


2014 ($200,000)
2015 $0
2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Texas State Library and Archives Commission (Commission), in consultation with institutions of higher education, to study the feasibility of requiring researchers whose research is partially or entirely funded with either state or federal money to submit to a state agency an electronic copy of each original research paper by the researcher that is accepted for publication in a peer-reviewed journal. The study would include: time requirements for submitting a research paper; the manner for providing public access to the research paper; and identification of state agencies that have resources necessary to collect and coordinate the dissemination of the research papers. The Commission would be required to submit a report of the results of the study to the Legislature not later than December 1, 2014. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in each house. Otherwise the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

Methodology

The Commission estimates a cost of $200,000 in fiscal year 2014 to contract with an external organization to conduct the study. Responses by several institutions of higher education indicate that costs to implement the provisions of the bill could be absorbed within their existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 306 Library & Archives Commission, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration, 758 Texas State University System, 768 Texas Tech University System Administration, 769 University of North Texas System Administration, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board, 783 University of Houston System Administration

306 Library & Archives Commission, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration, 758 Texas State University System, 768 Texas Tech University System Administration, 769 University of North Texas System Administration, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board, 783 University of Houston System Administration

LBB Staff: UP, KJo, EP, LCO

 UP, KJo, EP, LCO