Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 68
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 28, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 4, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 68 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a request for a waiver of the waiting period before
 human remains may be cremated.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 716.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  The county medical examiner, or, in counties that do not
 have a county medical examiner, justices of the peace, shall
 develop and maintain a written policy for requesting a written
 waiver of the 48-hour waiting period before cremation.  In
 developing the policy, the medical examiner or justices of the
 peace shall consider how persons may make a request, the
 availability to make a request on weekends or holidays, and other
 issues relevant to processing a request as swiftly as possible.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *