Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB741 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 741
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2013; February 26, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1; March 18, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 741 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period during which an employee may file a claim for
 unpaid wages with the Texas Workforce Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 61.051, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A wage claim must be filed not later than the first
 anniversary of [180th day after] the date the wages claimed became
 due for payment.  The filing [180-day] deadline is a matter of
 jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 61.051, Labor Code, applies to a wage claim filed under Subchapter
 D, Chapter 61, Labor Code, for wages that become due for payment on
 or after March 5, 2013.  A wage claim for wages that became due for
 payment before that date is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *