Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB748 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 748
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2013; February 26, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 25, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 748 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain tax revenue to enhance and upgrade
 convention center facilities, multipurpose arenas, multiuse
 facilities, and related infrastructure in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1015.  CERTAIN QUALIFIED PROJECTS. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Base year amount" means the amount of
 hotel-associated revenue collected in a project financing zone
 during the calendar year in which a municipality designates the
 zone.
 (2)  "Hotel-associated revenue" means the sum of:
 (A)  state tax revenue collected in a project
 financing zone from all hotels located in the zone that would be
 available to the owners of qualified hotel projects under Section
 151.429(h) if the hotels were qualified hotel projects, excluding
 the amount of that revenue received by a municipality under Section
 351.102(c) for a hotel project described by Section 351.102(b) and
 located in the zone that exists on the date the municipality
 designates the zone; and
 (B)  tax revenue collected from all permittees
 under Chapter 183 at hotels located in the zone, excluding revenue
 disbursed by the comptroller under Section 183.051(b).
 (3)  "Incremental hotel-associated revenue" means the
 amount in any calendar year by which hotel-associated revenue,
 including hotel-associated revenue from hotels built in the project
 financing zone after the year in which a municipality designates
 the zone, exceeds the base year amount.
 (4)  "Project financing zone" means an area within a
 municipality:
 (A)  that the municipality by ordinance or by
 agreement under Chapter 380, Local Government Code, designates as a
 project financing zone;
 (B)  the boundaries of which are within a
 three-mile radius of the center of a qualified project;
 (C)  the designation of which specifies the
 longitude and latitude of the center of the qualified project; and
 (D)  the designation of which expires not later
 than the 30th anniversary of the date of designation.
 (5)  "Qualified project" means a convention center
 facility, a multipurpose arena, a multiuse facility, and any
 related infrastructure or a venue as defined by Section 334.001,
 Local Government Code, that is:
 (A)  located on land owned by a municipality or by
 the owner of the venue;
 (B)  if the project is not a convention center
 facility, partially financed by private contributions that equal
 not less than 40 percent of the project costs; and
 (C)  related to the promotion of tourism and the
 convention and hotel industry.
 (b)  This section applies only to a qualified project located
 in a municipality with a population of at least 650,000 but less
 than 750,000.
 (c)  In addition to the uses provided by Section 351.101,
 revenue from the municipal hotel occupancy tax may be used to fund a
 qualified project.
 (d)  A municipality may pledge the revenue derived from the
 tax imposed under this chapter from a hotel located in the project
 financing zone for the payment of bonds or other obligations issued
 or incurred to acquire, lease, construct, improve, enlarge, and
 equip the qualified project.
 (e)  A municipality may pledge for the payment of bonds or
 other obligations described by Subsection (d) the local revenue
 from eligible tax proceeds as defined by Section 2303.5055(e),
 Government Code, from hotels located in a project financing zone
 that would be available to the owners of qualified hotel projects
 under that section if the hotels were qualified hotel projects,
 excluding any amount received by the municipality for a hotel
 project described by Section 351.102(b) and located in the zone
 that exists on the date the municipality designates the zone.
 (f)  A municipality shall notify the comptroller of the
 municipality's designation of a project financing zone not later
 than the 30th day after the date the municipality designates the
 zone.  Notwithstanding other law, the municipality is entitled to
 receive the incremental hotel-associated revenue from the project
 financing zone for the period beginning on the first day of the year
 after the year in which the municipality designates the zone and
 ending on the last day of the month during which the designation
 expires.  The municipality may pledge the revenue for the payment of
 bonds or other obligations described by Subsection (d).
 (g)  The comptroller shall deposit incremental
 hotel-associated revenue collected by or forwarded to the
 comptroller in a separate suspense account to be held in trust for
 the municipality that is entitled to receive the revenue.  The
 suspense account is outside the state treasury, and the comptroller
 may make a payment authorized by this section from the account
 without the necessity of an appropriation. The comptroller shall
 begin making payments from the suspense account to the municipality
 for which the money is held on the date the qualified project in the
 project financing zone is commenced.  If the qualified project is
 not commenced by the fifth anniversary of the first deposit to the
 account, the comptroller shall transfer the money in the account to
 the general revenue fund and cease making deposits to the account.
 (h)  The comptroller may estimate the amount of incremental
 hotel-associated revenue that will be deposited to a suspense
 account under Subsection (g) during each calendar year.  The
 comptroller may make deposits to the account and the municipality
 may request disbursements from the account on a monthly basis based
 on the estimate.  At the end of each calendar year, the comptroller
 shall adjust the deposits and disbursements to reflect the amount
 of revenue actually deposited to the account during the calendar
 year.
 (i)  A municipality shall notify the comptroller if the
 qualified project in the project financing zone is abandoned.  If
 the qualified project is abandoned, the comptroller shall transfer
 to the general revenue fund the amount of money in the suspense
 account that exceeds the amount required for the payment of bonds or
 other obligations described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 351.1065, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An eligible central municipality shall use the amount of
 revenue from the tax that is derived from the application of the tax
 at a rate of more than seven percent of the cost of a room only for:
 (1)  the construction of an expansion of an existing
 convention center facility; [and]
 (2)  a qualified project to which Section 351.1015
 applies; and
 (3)  pledging payment of revenue bonds and revenue
 refunding bonds issued under Subchapter A, Chapter 1504, Government
 Code, for the construction or qualified project [of the expansion].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *