Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB769 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 25, 2013      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB769 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Family Code by adding Section 264.124, which would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to establish a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children by May 1, 2014. Section 264.124 of the Family Code would expire September 1, 2017. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, SJ, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 25, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB769 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB769 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB769 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children.), As Introduced

SB769 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Family Code by adding Section 264.124, which would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to establish a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children by May 1, 2014. Section 264.124 of the Family Code would expire September 1, 2017. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill.

The bill would amend the Family Code by adding Section 264.124, which would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to establish a pilot program to provide specialized training to foster parents of certain children by May 1, 2014.

Section 264.124 of the Family Code would expire September 1, 2017.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, SJ, VJC

 UP, CL, SJ, VJC