Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB769 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 769
 (McClendon)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide
 specialized training to foster parents of certain children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.124 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.124.  FOSTER PARENT PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The
 department shall establish a pilot program to provide specialized
 training to foster parents of children who have been traumatized or
 have serious mental health needs if the department or another state
 agency is able to provide the training using existing resources or a
 local governmental entity or charitable organization is able to
 provide the training at no cost to the state.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  establish the pilot program in a county with a
 population of at least 1.5 million that is within 200 miles of an
 international border;
 (2)  coordinate the specialized training as part of
 community-based services and support provided under a Wraparound
 individualized planning process for foster children as prescribed
 by the Texas Integrated Funding Initiative Consortium; and
 (3)  evaluate the pilot program not later than the
 second anniversary of the date the program is established.
 (c)  The department shall prepare a report containing the
 evaluation required under Subsection (b)(3) and the department's
 recommendations on the feasibility and continuation of the pilot
 program.  The department shall submit electronically a copy of the
 report to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives not later than December 1, 2016.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than May 1, 2014, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall establish the pilot program
 required under Section 264.124, Family Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.