Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB772 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 772
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2013; February 26, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Rural
 Affairs, and Homeland Security; April 11, 2013, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the elimination of obsolete and redundant reporting
 requirements for the Department of Agriculture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (b), (c), and (d), Section 58.016,
 Agriculture Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  On or before August 1 of each year, the administrator
 shall file with the board the proposed annual budgets for the young
 farmer loan guarantee program under Subchapter E, the farm and
 ranch finance program under Chapter 59, and the programs
 administered by the board under this chapter for the succeeding
 fiscal year. If there is no administrator, the commissioner shall
 assume the duties of the administrator in connection with
 preparation of the budget. The budget must set forth the general
 categories of expected expenditures out of revenues and income of
 the funds administered by the authority and the amount on account of
 each. On or before September 1 of each year, the board shall
 consider the proposed annual budget and may approve it or amend it.
 [Copies of the annual budget certified by the chairman of the board
 shall be promptly filed with the governor and the legislature. The
 annual budget is not effective until it is filed.] If for any
 reason the authority does not adopt an annual budget before
 September 2, no expenditures may be made from the funds until the
 board approves the annual budget. The authority may adopt an
 amended annual budget for the current fiscal year[, but the amended
 annual budget may not supersede a prior budget until it is filed
 with the governor and the legislature].
 (c)  The authority shall have an audit of its books and
 accounts for each fiscal year by a certified public accountant.  The
 cost of the audit is an expense of the authority.  [A copy of the
 audit shall be filed with the governor and the legislature on or
 before January 1 of each year.]
 (d)  On or before January 1 of each year, the authority shall
 prepare a report of its activities for the preceding fiscal year.
 The report must set forth a complete operating and financial
 statement. [The authority shall file copies of the report with the
 governor and the legislature as soon as practicable.]
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 487.051, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The office shall:
 (1)  assist rural communities in the key areas of
 economic development, community development, rural health, and
 rural housing;
 (2)  serve as a clearinghouse for information and
 resources on all state and federal programs affecting rural
 communities;
 (3)  in consultation with rural community leaders,
 locally elected officials, state elected and appointed officials,
 academic and industry experts, and the interagency work group
 created under this chapter, identify and prioritize policy issues
 and concerns affecting rural communities in the state;
 (4)  make recommendations to the legislature to address
 the concerns affecting rural communities identified under
 Subdivision (3);
 (5)  monitor developments that have a substantial
 effect on rural Texas communities, especially actions of state
 government[, and compile an annual report describing and evaluating
 the condition of rural communities];
 (6)  administer the federal community development
 block grant nonentitlement program;
 (7)  administer programs supporting rural health care
 as provided by this chapter;
 (8)  perform research to determine the most beneficial
 and cost-effective ways to improve the welfare of rural
 communities;
 (9)  ensure that the office qualifies as the state's
 office of rural health for the purpose of receiving grants from the
 Office of Rural Health Policy of the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services under 42 U.S.C. Section 254r;
 (10)  manage the state's Medicare rural hospital
 flexibility program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1395i-4;
 (11)  seek state and federal money available for
 economic development in rural areas for programs under this
 chapter;
 (12)  in conjunction with other offices and divisions
 of the Department of Agriculture, regularly cross-train office
 employees with other employees of the Department of Agriculture
 regarding the programs administered and services provided to rural
 communities; and
 (13)  work with interested persons to assist volunteer
 fire departments and emergency services districts in rural areas.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (b), Section 487.804, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than January 1 of each even-numbered year, the
 commissioner shall submit to the legislature a report of the
 findings of the advisory council and the activities of the Texas
 Rural Foundation.
 SECTION 4.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Section 15.006, Agriculture Code;
 (2)  Subsections (e) and (f), Section 102.167,
 Agriculture Code;
 (3)  Section 487.056, Government Code; and
 (4)  Section 487.653, Government Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *