Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB830 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 830
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 15, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 830 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use of telemedicine in certain trauma facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1151 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.1151.  USE OF TELEMEDICINE BY CERTAIN TRAUMA
 FACILITIES. (a)  In this section, "telemedicine" means a health
 care service that is initiated by a physician, advanced practice
 nurse, or physician assistant and that requires the use of advanced
 telecommunications technology, other than telephone or facsimile
 technology, including:
 (1)  compressed digital interactive video, audio, or
 data transmission;
 (2)  clinical data transmission using computer imaging
 by way of still-image capture and store and forward; and
 (3)  other technology that facilitates access to health
 care services or medical specialty expertise.
 (b)  A health care facility located in a county with a
 population of less than 50,000 may use telemedicine to satisfy a
 level IV trauma facility designation requirement relating to
 physicians if an on-call physician who has special competence in
 the care of critically injured patients uses telemedicine to
 provide patient assessment, diagnosis, consultation, or treatment
 or to transfer medical data to a physician, advanced practice
 nurse, or physician assistant located at the facility.
 (c)  Department rules may not, as part of the requirements
 for designation of the facility as a level IV trauma facility,
 require the physical presence or physical availability of a
 physician who has special competence in the care of critically
 injured patients and may not prohibit the use of telemedicine that
 meets the requirements of Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section
 773.1151, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than December 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 773.1151, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a health care facility located in
 a county with a population of less than 50,000 may use telemedicine
 to satisfy a level IV trauma facility designation requirement only
 on or after January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *