Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB835 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 835
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 835 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the limit on appraised value of a
 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to an improvement
 that is a replacement structure for a structure that was rendered
 uninhabitable or unusable by a casualty or by wind or water damage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.23, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  In this subsection, "disaster recovery program" means
 the disaster recovery program administered by the General Land
 Office that is funded with community development block grant
 disaster recovery money authorized by the Consolidated Security,
 Disaster Assistance, and Continuing Appropriations Act, 2009 (Pub.
 L. No. 110-329) and the Consolidated and Further Continuing
 Appropriations Act, 2012 (Pub. L. No. 112-55).  Notwithstanding
 Subsection (f)(2), and only to the extent necessary to satisfy the
 requirements of the disaster recovery program, a replacement
 structure described by that subdivision is not considered to be a
 new improvement if to satisfy the requirements of the disaster
 recovery program it was necessary that:
 (1)  the square footage of the replacement structure
 exceed that of the replaced structure as that structure existed
 before the casualty or damage occurred; or
 (2)  the exterior of the replacement structure be of
 higher quality construction and composition than that of the
 replaced structure.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of a
 residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that
 begins on or after January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *