Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB852 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 852
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 18, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 852 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to availability of certain property and casualty insurance
 forms.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 10, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1812 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1812.  AVAILABILITY OF SPECIMEN POLICIES
 Sec. 1812.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "specimen
 policy" means a standardized form, including an insurance policy
 form or endorsement, used by an insurer to write personal
 automobile, commercial automobile, inland marine, or residential
 property insurance in this state that does not contain personally
 identifiable information about an insured.
 Sec. 1812.002.  AVAILABILITY OF CERTAIN FORMS.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this code relating to
 the delivery of policy forms, an insurer may elect to make a
 personal automobile, commercial automobile, inland marine, or
 residential property insurance policy available to an insured by
 posting a specimen policy on the insurer's Internet website instead
 of other authorized means.  An insurer making the election must
 comply with Section 1812.003.
 (b)  On request of and at no cost to an insured, an insurer
 shall provide to the insured a copy of a specimen policy applicable
 to the insured that is posted on the insurer's Internet website.
 Sec. 1812.003.  NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF CERTAIN FORMS.
 (a)  An insurer that posts a specimen policy on the insurer's
 Internet website under this chapter must, on issuance or renewal of
 a policy incorporating the specimen policy:
 (1)  on the declarations page of the insured's policy:
 (A)  disclose that the specimen policy is
 available on the insurer's Internet website; and
 (B)  clearly identify each posted specimen policy
 incorporated into the insured's policy;
 (2)  explain that and how an insured, on request and at
 no charge, may obtain a copy of the specimen policy from the
 insurer; and
 (3)  provide to the department and the office of public
 insurance counsel an electronic copy of the specimen policy that
 may be posted on the Internet website of the department or the
 office of public insurance counsel.
 (b)  An insurer that during an insured's policy period posts
 a specimen policy or amends a posted specimen policy incorporated
 into an insured's policy must, on the date the specimen policy is
 posted or amended, in writing and in the insurer's customary manner
 of communicating with the insured:
 (1)  notify the insured that the specimen policy is
 available on the insurer's Internet website;
 (2)  clearly identify each added or amended specimen
 policy incorporated into the insured's policy; and
 (3)  explain that and how the insured, on request and at
 no charge, may obtain a copy of the specimen policy from the
 insurer.
 Sec. 1812.004.  ACCESSIBILITY OF CERTAIN AVAILABLE FORMS.  A
 specimen policy posted on the insurer's Internet website under this
 chapter must be, until no policy incorporating the specimen policy
 is in force:
 (1)  easily accessible on the website; and
 (2)  provided in a format readily capable of being
 saved or printed using a widely available and free computer
 application or program.
 Sec. 1812.005.  RETENTION OF CERTAIN AVAILABLE FORMS.  An
 insurer that posts a specimen policy on the insurer's Internet
 website under this chapter must for at least five years after the
 latest date a policy incorporating the specimen policy is in force:
 (1)  preserve an electronic copy of the specimen
 policy; and
 (2)  make a printed or electronic copy of the specimen
 policy available on request at no cost.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an insurance policy that
 is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *