Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB872 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 872


 AN ACT
 relating to county expenditures for certain health care services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.036, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  Regardless of the application, documentation, and
 verification procedures or eligibility standards established by
 the department under Subchapter A, a county may credit an
 intergovernmental transfer to the state toward eligibility for
 state assistance if the transfer was made to provide health care
 services as part of the Texas Healthcare Transformation and Quality
 Improvement Program waiver issued under 42 U.S.C. Section 1315.
 (e)  A county may credit toward eligibility for state
 assistance intergovernmental transfers made under Subsection (d)
 that in the aggregate do not exceed four percent of the county's
 general revenue levy in any state fiscal year, provided:
 (1)  the commissioners court determines that the
 expenditure fulfills the county's obligations to provide indigent
 health care under this chapter;
 (2)  the commissioners court determines that the amount
 of care available through participation in the waiver is sufficient
 in type and amount to meet the requirements of this chapter; and
 (3)  the county receives periodic reports from health
 care providers that receive supplemental or incentive payments
 under the Texas Healthcare Transformation and Quality Improvement
 Program waiver that document the number and types of services
 provided to persons who are eligible to receive services under this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2014, the Department
 of State Health Services shall submit a report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives on the effects of the provisions of this Act on
 services rendered to eligible residents under Chapter 61, Health
 and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The change in law made by this Act to
 Section 61.036, Health and Safety Code, applies only to state
 assistance for health care services under Chapter 61, Health and
 Safety Code, as amended by this Act, that are delivered on or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  State assistance for health care services under Chapter
 61, Health and Safety Code, that are delivered before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 872 passed the Senate on
 April 25, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 872 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor