Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB877 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 877
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 25, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 25, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing the Citizens' Star of Texas Award.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3106.001, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (4) to read as follows:
 (4)  "Next of kin" means the relative in the nearest
 degree of relationship to a deceased person, including the person's
 spouse, child, parent, or sibling.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 3106, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 3106.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 3106.0041.  CITIZENS' STAR OF TEXAS AWARD. (a)  The
 Citizens' Star of Texas Award shall be awarded to:
 (1)  a private citizen who is seriously injured while
 aiding or attempting to aid a peace officer, firefighter, or
 emergency medical first responder in the performance of the duties
 of the officer, firefighter, or first responder; and
 (2)  the surviving next of kin of a private citizen who
 is killed or sustains a fatal injury while aiding or attempting to
 aid a peace officer, firefighter, or emergency medical first
 responder in the performance of the duties of the officer,
 firefighter, or first responder.
 (b)  The Peace Officers' Star of Texas Award Advisory
 Committee under Section 3106.002, the Firefighters' Star of Texas
 Award Advisory Committee under Section 3106.003, and the Emergency
 Medical First Responders' Star of Texas Award Advisory Committee
 under Section 3106.004, as applicable, shall advise the governor on
 the issuance, design, and presentation of the Citizens' Star of
 Texas Award.
 SECTION 3.  Section 3106.007, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 3106.007.  RECOMMENDATION FOR AWARD.  (a)  Any person
 who has personal knowledge that a peace officer, firefighter, or
 emergency medical first responder has been killed or seriously
 injured in the line of duty, or that a federal law enforcement
 officer or special agent has been killed or seriously injured while
 performing duties in this state to assist a state or local law
 enforcement agency, may submit that information in writing to a
 committee under this chapter.
 (b)  The head of an agency that employs a peace officer,
 firefighter, or emergency medical first responder who has knowledge
 of a private citizen described by Section 3106.0041(a) and a state
 legislator representing the district in which the private citizen
 resides may submit information about the private citizen in writing
 to a committee under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *