Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB895 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, Ellis S.B. No. 895
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Open Government;
 April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 11, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 895 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to records of a nonprofit organization
 supporting the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas
 under the public information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.262, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The records of a nonprofit organization established to
 provide support to the institute shall be made available to the
 public.  A record that is available under this subsection is public
 information subject to Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *