Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB930 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 930
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2013; March 12, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 3, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 3, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 930 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale and use of certain land used for a world
 exposition.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 253.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (m), (n), and (o) to read as follows:
 (m)  Subsection (b) does not apply to the sale of a public
 square or park if:
 (1)  the land was part of the site of a world exposition
 recognized by the Bureau International des Expositions; and
 (2)  the remainder of the world exposition site
 includes a dedicated public square or park that has a total area of
 18 acres or more.
 (n)  The area dedicated under Subsection (m)(2) may include
 an area for which the municipality commits to demolishing any non
 park improvements within 48 months after the date of the
 dedication.
 (o)  A petition for judicial review of a sale under
 Subsection (m) must be filed on or before the 60th day after the
 date the ordinance or resolution authorizing the sale is adopted. A
 petition filed after that date is barred.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 253, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 253.0011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 253.0011.  SALE OR LEASE OF LAND USED FOR WORLD
 EXPOSITION RESTRICTED. (a)  If a municipality sells or leases land
 described by Section 253.001(m)(1), the aggregate square footage of
 hotel improvements to be constructed on any property sold or leased
 that was part of the site of a world exposition recognized by the
 Bureau International des Expositions may not exceed the greater of:
 (1)  20 percent of the aggregate square footage of any
 improvements other than a convention center on that land that are
 constructed by the municipality after June 1, 2013; or
 (2)  400,000 square feet.
 (b)  In this section, "hotel improvements" means hotel guest
 rooms, hallways adjacent to guest rooms, and lobby areas.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *