Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB949 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 949
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 March 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of license holder in the Medical
 Practice Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 151.002, Occupations
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) to read as follows:
 (6-a)  "License holder" means a person holding a
 license, permit, or certificate issued under this subtitle.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *