Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB949 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 949


 AN ACT
 relating to licensing under the Medical Practice Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 151.002, Occupations
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) to read as follows:
 (6-a)  "License holder" means a person holding a
 license, permit, or certificate issued under this subtitle.
 SECTION 2.  Section 155.051, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The time frame to pass each part of the examination does
 not apply to an applicant who:
 (1)  is licensed and in good standing as a physician in
 another state;
 (2)  has been licensed for at least five years;
 (3)  does not hold a medical license in the other state
 that has or has ever had any restrictions, disciplinary orders, or
 probation; and
 (4)  will practice in a medically underserved area or a
 health manpower shortage area, as those terms are defined by
 Section 157.052.
 (e)  The board may by rule establish a process to verify that
 a person, after meeting the requirements of Subsection (d),
 practices only in an area described by Subsection (d)(4).
 SECTION 3.  Section 155.0045, Occupations Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 949 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 949 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 3, two present not voting; May 25, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor