Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB987 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar, Campbell S.B. No. 987
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Rural Affairs,
 and Homeland Security; March 27, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 987 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing the attorney general to obtain an injunction
 against a municipality or county that adopts prohibited regulations
 regarding firearms, ammunition, or firearm supplies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 229.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The attorney general may bring an action in the name of
 the state to obtain a temporary or permanent injunction against a
 municipality adopting a regulation in violation of this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 236.002, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 236.002.  FIREARMS; SPORT SHOOTING RANGE.
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, including Chapter 251,
 Agriculture Code, a county may not adopt regulations relating to:
 (1)  the transfer, private ownership, keeping,
 transportation, licensing, or registration of firearms,
 ammunition, or firearm supplies; or
 (2)  the discharge of a firearm at a sport shooting
 range.
 (b)  The attorney general may bring an action in the name of
 the state to obtain a temporary or permanent injunction against a
 county adopting a regulation, other than a regulation under Section
 236.003, in violation of this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *