Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB993 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 993


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Texas Nonprofit Council to assist
 with faith-based and community-based initiatives.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 535.055, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 535.055.  TEXAS NONPROFIT COUNCIL [TASK FORCE ON
 IMPROVING RELATIONS WITH NONPROFITS]. (a)  The Texas Nonprofit
 Council [interagency coordinating group task force] is established
 to help direct the interagency coordinating group in carrying out
 the group's duties under this section.  The commission shall
 provide administrative support to the council [task force].
 (b)  The executive commissioner, in consultation with the
 presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group, shall
 appoint as members of the council two representatives [task force
 one representative] from each of the following groups and entities:
 (1)  [a] statewide nonprofit organizations
 [organization];
 (2)  local governments;
 (3)  faith-based groups;
 (4)  community-based groups;
 (5)  consultants to nonprofit corporations; and
 (6)  [experts in grant writing; and
 [(7)  a] statewide associations [association] of
 nonprofit organizations.
 (c)  The council [In addition to the interagency
 coordinating group's other duties, the interagency coordinating
 group], in coordination with the interagency coordinating group
 [task force], shall:
 (1)  make recommendations [develop and implement a
 plan] for improving contracting relationships between state
 agencies and faith- and community-based organizations;
 (2)  develop best practices for cooperating and
 collaborating with faith- and community-based organizations;
 (3)  identify and address duplication of services
 provided by the state and faith- and community-based organizations;
 and
 (4)  identify and address gaps in state services that
 faith- and community-based organizations could fill.
 (c-1)  The council shall elect a chair or chairs and
 secretary from among its members and shall assist the executive
 commissioner in identifying individuals to fill vacant council
 positions that arise.
 (c-2)  Council members serve three-year terms. The terms
 expire on October 1 of every third year.  A council member shall
 serve a maximum of two consecutive terms.
 (d)  The council [task force] shall prepare a biennial report
 detailing the council's work, including [describing actions taken
 or not taken by the interagency coordinating group under this
 section and include] in the report any recommendations relating to
 legislation necessary to address an issue identified [by the group]
 under this section.  The council [task force] shall present the
 report to the House Committee on Human Services or its successor,
 the House Committee on Public Health or its successor, and the
 Senate Health and Human Services Committee or its successor not
 later than December 1 of each even-numbered year [September 1,
 2012].
 (e)  Chapter 2110 does not apply to the Texas Nonprofit
 Council.
 (f)  The Texas Nonprofit Council is subject to Chapter 325
 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by
 that chapter, the council is abolished and this section expires
 September 1, 2019.  [This section expires September 1, 2013.]
 SECTION 2.  Not later than October 1, 2013, and by October 1
 every three years thereafter, the executive commissioner of the
 Health and Human Services Commission shall appoint members to the
 Texas Nonprofit Council in accordance with Section 535.055,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect August 31, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the Senate on
 April 18, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor