S.B. No. 993 AN ACT relating to the creation of the Texas Nonprofit Council to assist with faith-based and community-based initiatives. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 535.055, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 535.055. TEXAS NONPROFIT COUNCIL [TASK FORCE ON IMPROVING RELATIONS WITH NONPROFITS]. (a) The Texas Nonprofit Council [interagency coordinating group task force] is established to help direct the interagency coordinating group in carrying out the group's duties under this section. The commission shall provide administrative support to the council [task force]. (b) The executive commissioner, in consultation with the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group, shall appoint as members of the council two representatives [task force one representative] from each of the following groups and entities: (1) [a] statewide nonprofit organizations [organization]; (2) local governments; (3) faith-based groups; (4) community-based groups; (5) consultants to nonprofit corporations; and (6) [experts in grant writing; and [(7) a] statewide associations [association] of nonprofit organizations. (c) The council [In addition to the interagency coordinating group's other duties, the interagency coordinating group], in coordination with the interagency coordinating group [task force], shall: (1) make recommendations [develop and implement a plan] for improving contracting relationships between state agencies and faith- and community-based organizations; (2) develop best practices for cooperating and collaborating with faith- and community-based organizations; (3) identify and address duplication of services provided by the state and faith- and community-based organizations; and (4) identify and address gaps in state services that faith- and community-based organizations could fill. (c-1) The council shall elect a chair or chairs and secretary from among its members and shall assist the executive commissioner in identifying individuals to fill vacant council positions that arise. (c-2) Council members serve three-year terms. The terms expire on October 1 of every third year. A council member shall serve a maximum of two consecutive terms. (d) The council [task force] shall prepare a biennial report detailing the council's work, including [describing actions taken or not taken by the interagency coordinating group under this section and include] in the report any recommendations relating to legislation necessary to address an issue identified [by the group] under this section. The council [task force] shall present the report to the House Committee on Human Services or its successor, the House Committee on Public Health or its successor, and the Senate Health and Human Services Committee or its successor not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year [September 1, 2012]. (e) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the Texas Nonprofit Council. (f) The Texas Nonprofit Council is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished and this section expires September 1, 2019. [This section expires September 1, 2013.] SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2013, and by October 1 every three years thereafter, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall appoint members to the Texas Nonprofit Council in accordance with Section 535.055, Government Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect August 31, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the Senate on April 18, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the House, with amendment, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 2, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor