Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR32 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Paxton S.J.R. No. 32
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 9, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 9, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 32 By:  Huffman


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize a political
 subdivision other than a school district to establish a limitation
 on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political subdivision may
 impose on the residence homesteads of persons who are disabled or
 elderly and their surviving spouses.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended by amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsections (h-1)
 and (h-2) to read as follows:
 (h)  The governing body of a political subdivision of this
 state other than a school [a county, a city or town, or a junior
 college] district by official action may provide that if a person
 who is disabled or is sixty-five (65) years of age or older receives
 a residence homestead exemption prescribed or authorized by this
 section, the total amount of ad valorem taxes imposed on that
 homestead by the political subdivision [county, the city or town,
 or the junior college district] may not be increased while it
 remains the residence homestead of that person or that person's
 spouse who is disabled or sixty-five (65) years of age or older and
 receives a residence homestead exemption on the homestead.
 (h-1)  In addition to the procedure described by Subsection
 (h) [As an alternative], on receipt of a petition signed by five
 percent (5%) of the registered voters of a [the] county, a [the]
 city or town, or a [the] junior college district, the governing body
 of the county, the city or town, or the junior college district
 shall call an election to determine by majority vote whether to
 establish a tax limitation provided by Subsection (h) [this
 subsection].
 (h-2)  If a political subdivision [county, a city or town, or
 a junior college district] establishes a tax limitation under the
 procedures prescribed by Subsection (h) or (h-1) [provided by this
 subsection] and a [disabled] person who is disabled or is [a person]
 sixty-five (65) years of age or older dies in a year in which the
 person received a residence homestead exemption, the total amount
 of ad valorem taxes imposed on the homestead by the political
 subdivision [county, the city or town, or the junior college
 district] may not be increased while it remains the residence
 homestead of that person's surviving spouse if the spouse is
 fifty-five (55) years of age or older at the time of the person's
 death, subject to any exceptions provided by general law.  The
 legislature, by general law, may provide for the transfer of all or
 a proportionate amount of a tax limitation provided under the
 procedures prescribed by Subsection (h) or (h-1) [by this
 subsection] for a person who qualifies for the limitation and
 establishes a different residence homestead within the same
 political subdivision [county, within the same city or town, or
 within the same junior college district].  A political subdivision
 [county, a city or town, or a junior college district] that
 establishes a tax limitation under the procedures prescribed by
 Subsection (h) or (h-1) [this subsection] must comply with a law
 providing for the transfer of the limitation, even if the
 legislature enacts the law subsequent to the political
 subdivision's [county's, the city's or town's, or the junior college
 district's] establishment of the limitation.  Taxes otherwise
 limited by a political subdivision [county, a city or town, or a
 junior college district] under the procedures prescribed by
 Subsection (h) or (h-1) [this subsection] may be increased to the
 extent the value of the homestead is increased by improvements
 other than repairs and other than improvements made to comply with
 governmental requirements and except as may be consistent with the
 transfer of a tax limitation under a law authorized by this
 subsection.  The governing body of a political subdivision [county,
 a city or town, or a junior college district] may not repeal or
 rescind a tax limitation established under the procedures
 prescribed by Subsection (h) or (h-1) [this subsection].
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, to authorize a political subdivision other
 than a school district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad
 valorem taxes the political subdivision may impose on the residence
 homesteads of persons who are disabled or elderly and their
 surviving spouses.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 1-b(h), Article VIII, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2014.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to authorize a
 political subdivision other than a school district to establish a
 limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political
 subdivision may impose on the residence homesteads of persons who
 are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses."
 * * * * *