Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR38 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R9779 MTB-D
 By: Williams S.J.R. No. 38


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of
 the state infrastructure fund and board to provide financial
 assistance for certain projects related to economic development
 infrastructure and for the transfer to the fund of money from the
 economic stabilization fund; making an appropriation.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 74 to read as follows:
 Sec. 74.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Board" means the State Infrastructure Board.
 (2)  "Economic development infrastructure" includes
 transportation infrastructure and port infrastructure.
 (3)  "Fund" means the state infrastructure fund.
 (4)  "Political subdivision" means:
 (A)  a county;
 (B)  a municipality; or
 (C)  another governmental unit that has the
 authority to build roads or operate and develop ports, including a
 district created under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59,
 Article XVI, of this constitution.
 (5)  "State agency" includes an institution of higher
 education, as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (6)  "Transportation institute" means a transportation
 research facility within The Texas A&M  University System.
 (b)  The State Infrastructure Board consists of three
 members appointed by the governor with:
 (1)  one member knowledgeable of or experienced in
 transportation planning;
 (2)  one member knowledgeable of or experienced in port
 issues; and
 (3)  one member knowledgeable of or experienced in
 urban planning and economic development.
 (c)  Members of the board serve staggered terms of six years,
 with the term of one member expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year. The governor shall designate a member of the board to serve as
 the presiding officer.
 (d)  A member of the board serves without compensation but is
 entitled to reimbursement for expenses as provided by the General
 Appropriations Act.
 (e)  The state infrastructure fund is a special revolving
 fund in the state treasury. The fund consists of:
 (1)  money the legislature appropriates to the fund;
 (2)  donations made to the fund;
 (3)  loan repayments received by the board from loans
 made under this section; and
 (4)  interest earned on the balance of the fund.
 (f)  The board may use money in the fund only to provide:
 (1)  loans to political subdivisions for projects
 related to economic development infrastructure; or
 (2)  credit enhancement to political subdivisions and
 other governmental entities that operate or maintain mass transit
 or toll projects for projects related to economic development
 infrastructure.
 (g)  State agencies shall provide assistance and advice to
 the board in prioritizing infrastructure projects for the provision
 of loans under this section.
 (h)  The transportation institute shall submit
 recommendations to the board regarding the use of money in the fund
 for use by the board in adopting rules under Subsection (i) of this
 section.
 (i)  The board shall adopt rules providing for the use of
 money in the fund consistent with this section, including rules:
 (1)  establishing standards for the eligibility of
 political subdivisions and other entities to receive loans or
 credit enhancement for projects related to economic development
 infrastructure under Subsection (f) of this section; and
 (2)  specifying the manner for prioritizing projects
 for lending or credit enhancement under Subsection (f) of this
 section.
 (j)  The board shall give appropriate consideration to the
 recommendations of the transportation institute before adopting
 rules under Subsection (i) of this section.
 (k)  Except as provided by Subsection (f)(2) of this section,
 money in the fund may not be used for transportation infrastructure
 projects that involve mass transit or toll projects.
 (l)  The amount of $3 billion is transferred from the
 economic stabilization fund to the credit of the fund, and that
 amount is appropriated to the board for the purposes of the state
 infrastructure fund for the state fiscal biennium beginning
 September 1, 2013.  This subsection expires August 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, providing for the creation of the state
 infrastructure fund and board to provide financial assistance for
 certain projects related to economic development infrastructure
 and for the transfer to the state infrastructure fund of money from
 the economic stabilization fund.
 (b)  Section 74, Article XVI, of this constitution takes
 effect January 1, 2014.
 (c)  Promptly after January 1, 2014, the governor shall
 appoint the initial members of the State Infrastructure Board in
 accordance with Section 74, Article XVI, of this constitution. Of
 those members, the governor shall designate one to serve a term
 expiring February 1, 2019, one to serve a term expiring February 1,
 2017, and one to serve a term expiring February 1, 2015.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 creation of the state infrastructure fund and board to provide
 financial assistance for certain projects related to economic
 development infrastructure and for the transfer to the fund of
 money from the economic stabilization fund."