Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR1085 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.R. No. 1085


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on
 Senate Bill 7 (improving the delivery and quality of certain
 health and human services, including the delivery and quality of
 Medicaid acute care services and long-term services and
 supports) to consider and take action on the following matters:
 (1)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the House
 or Senate version of the bill by adding proposed SECTION 2.03 to
 ARTICLE 2 of the bill to read as follows:
 SECTION 2.03.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 533.00285 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.00285.  STAR + PLUS QUALITY COUNCIL.  (a)  The
 STAR + PLUS Quality Council is established to advise the
 commission on the development of policy recommendations that
 will ensure eligible recipients receive quality,
 person-centered, consumer-directed acute care services and
 long-term services and supports in an integrated setting under
 the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall appoint the members
 of the council, who must be stakeholders from the acute care
 services and long-term services and supports community,
 including:
 (1)  representatives of health and human services
 agencies;
 (2)  recipients under the STAR + PLUS Medicaid
 managed care program;
 (3)  representatives of advocacy groups representing
 individuals with disabilities and seniors who are recipients
 under the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program;
 (4)  representatives of service providers for
 individuals with disabilities; and
 (5)  representatives of health maintenance
 organizations.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall appoint the
 presiding officer of the council.
 (d)  The council shall meet at least quarterly or more
 frequently if the presiding officer determines that it is
 necessary to carry out the responsibilities of the council.
 (e)  Not later than November 1 of each year, the council in
 coordination with the commission shall submit a report to the
 executive commissioner that includes:
 (1)  an analysis and assessment of the quality of
 acute care services and long-term services and supports provided
 under the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program;
 (2)  recommendations regarding how to improve the
 quality of acute care services and long-term services and
 supports provided under the program; and
 (3)  recommendations regarding how to ensure that
 recipients eligible to receive services and supports under the
 program receive person-centered, consumer-directed care in the
 most integrated setting achievable.
 (f)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the commission, in consultation with the council, shall submit a
 report to the legislature regarding the assessments and
 recommendations contained in any report submitted by the council
 under Subsection (e) during the most recent state fiscal
 biennium.
 (g)  The council is subject to the requirements of Chapter
 551.
 (h)  A member of the council serves without compensation.
 (i)  On January 1, 2017:
 (1)  the council is abolished; and
 (2)  this section expires.
 Explanation:  The change is necessary to establish the
 STAR + PLUS Quality Council and provide for the operation and
 duties of the council.
 (2)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the House
 or Senate version of the bill by adding proposed SECTION 2.13 to
 ARTICLE 2 of the bill to read as follows:
 SECTION 2.13.  (a)  Not later than October 1, 2013, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall appoint the members of the STAR + PLUS Quality
 Council as required by Section 533.00285, Government Code, as
 added by this article.
 (b)  The STAR + PLUS Quality Council, in coordination with
 the Health and Human Services Commission, shall submit:
 (1)  the initial report required under Subsection
 (e), Section 533.00285, Government Code, as added by this
 article, not later than November 1, 2014; and
 (2)  the final report required under that subsection
 not later than November 1, 2016.
 (c)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall
 submit:
 (1)  the initial report required under Subsection
 (f), Section 533.00285, Government Code, as added by this
 article, not later than December 1, 2014; and
 (2)  the final report required under that subsection
 not later than December 1, 2016.
 Explanation:  The change is necessary to ensure the
 appointment of members to the STAR + PLUS Quality Council by
 October 1, 2013, and to establish the dates by which certain
 reports required under Section 533.00285, Government Code, must
 be submitted by the council and by the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (3)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the House
 or Senate version of the bill by adding proposed SECTION 2.16 to
 ARTICLE 2 of the bill to read as follows:
 SECTION 2.16.  Not later than September 15, 2013, the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the members of the STAR + PLUS
 Nursing Facility Advisory Committee as required by Section
 533.00252, Government Code, as added by this article.
 Explanation:  The change is necessary to ensure the
 appointment of members to the STAR + PLUS Nursing Facility
 Advisory Committee by September 15, 2013.
  _______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 26, 2013, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
  _______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate