Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate 2013 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR246

In memory of Santos "Blondie" Aguilar of Fort Worth.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR247

Recognizing B. R. Daniels, Sr., of Fort Worth for his 40 years in the ministry.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR248

Recognizing February 19, 2013, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR249

Recognizing February 21, 2013, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR25

In memory of James Andrew Bridges of Mansfield.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR250

Recognizing February 20, 2013, as Andrews County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR251

Recognizing Sam L. Susser for being named BorderFest's Border Texan of the Year.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR252

Celebrating Kinney County Day.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR253

Recognizing the naming ceremony of Hines Memorial Church of God in Christ in Texas City.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR254

In memory of Carolyn Jeanette Covington Bunting of Fort Worth.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR255

Recognizing March 6, 2013, as Mansfield Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR256

Recognizing Senator Eduardo Lucio and Herminia Lucio on the occasion of their 45th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR257

Recognizing Norman L. Robinson on the occasion of his 92nd birthday.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR258

Recognizing the Dallas Alumnae Chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Incorporated, on the occasion of the sorority's centennial.
TX

Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR259

Recognizing February 25, 2013, as The Links, Incorporated, Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records