Texas 2013 83rd 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB2 House Committee Report / Witness List

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    WITNESS LIST  HB 2   HOUSE COMMITTEE REPORT  Redistricting, Select Committee  May 31, 2013 - 9:00 AM   For :  Durham, Pam (Self)  Pintchovski, Susan (National organization of Jewish Women - Texas State Advocacy   Poilcy Network)  Toodle, Cynthia (Self)  Wallace, B R "SKIPPER" (Self; Texas Republican County Chairs Association)  Against :  Brown, Claudia (Self)  Collier, Stephanie (Self; Communication workers of America District 6)  Huff, Harold (Self)  Patrick, John (Texas AFL CIO)  On :  Banks, Yannis (Texas naacp)  Hanna, David R. (Texas Legislative Council)  Perales, Nina (MALDEF (Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund))  Registering, but not testifying:  Against :  Simpson, Matt (ACLU of Texas)  On :  Arndt, Tim (Self)  Fischer, Ashley (Texas Secretary of State)  June 1, 2013 - 9:00 AM   Registering, but not testifying:  Against :  Dufresne, Jc (Self; Common cause texas)  On :  Ingram, Keith (Texas Secretary of State, Elections Division)  June 6, 2013 - 2:00 PM   For :  De Leon, Sergio (Self; Self)  Greene, Mark (Self)  Jenkins, Linda (Self)  Joyce, Sandy (Self)  Petta, Michael (Self)  Schwarz, Janice (Self)  White, Camile (Self)  Against :  Griffin, Roy (Self)  McGovern, Katherine (Self)  Stevens, Shawn (Self; Democratic Party of Collin County)  Registering, but not testifying:  For :  Anderson, Ida (Self)  Atkins, Vera (Self)  Galloway, Bruce (Self)  Galloway, Carolyn (Self)  1    WITNESS LIST  HB 2   HOUSE COMMITTEE REPORT  Redistricting, Select Committee  Johnson, Gwen (Self)  Lee, Opal (Self)  Lewis, Rosie D. (Rosa) (Self)  Napier, Tina (Self)  Narvaez, Omar (Self; Stonewall Dallas)  Warren, Mary (Self)  Against :  Blackwell, Tom (Self)  Martinez, Pedro (Self)  Richardson, Pat (Self)  Strater, Jeff (Self)  Tovar, Dora (Self)  On :  Harless, Barbara (Self)  June 10, 2013 - 2:00 PM   Against :  Cadena, Eli (Self)  Gonzalez y Menchaca, Sher (Self)  Korbel, George (LULAC National)  Registering, but not testifying:  For :  Sands, Kara (Self; Hispanic Republicans of Nueces County)  June 12, 2013 - 2:00 PM   Against :  Blavier, Rhys (Self)  Lockett, Joseph (Self)  Longhofer, Kyle I (Self)  Moffitt, Jill (Self)  Registering, but not testifying:  For :  Presley, Louise (Self)  Tijerina, Joseph (Precinct Chair 0026: Harris County)  Against :  Ashley, Larry (Self)  Brown, Vicki (Self)  Hailey, Mary (Self)  Sterling, SJ (Self)  Williams, Daniel (Equality Texas)  2 

 WITNESS LIST

 HB 2 

 HOUSE COMMITTEE REPORT

 Redistricting, Select Committee

 May 31, 2013 - 9:00 AM 

 For :

 Durham, Pam (Self)

 Pintchovski, Susan (National organization of Jewish Women - Texas State Advocacy 

 Poilcy Network)

 Toodle, Cynthia (Self)

 Wallace, B R "SKIPPER" (Self; Texas Republican County Chairs Association)

 Against :

 Brown, Claudia (Self)

 Collier, Stephanie (Self; Communication workers of America District 6)

 Huff, Harold (Self)

 Patrick, John (Texas AFL CIO)

 On :

 Banks, Yannis (Texas naacp)

 Hanna, David R. (Texas Legislative Council)

 Perales, Nina (MALDEF (Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund))

 Registering, but not testifying:

 Against :

 Simpson, Matt (ACLU of Texas)

 On :

 Arndt, Tim (Self)

 Fischer, Ashley (Texas Secretary of State)

 June 1, 2013 - 9:00 AM 

 Registering, but not testifying:

 Against :

 Dufresne, Jc (Self; Common cause texas)

 On :

 Ingram, Keith (Texas Secretary of State, Elections Division)

 June 6, 2013 - 2:00 PM 

 For :

 De Leon, Sergio (Self; Self)

 Greene, Mark (Self)

 Jenkins, Linda (Self)

 Joyce, Sandy (Self)

 Petta, Michael (Self)

 Schwarz, Janice (Self)

 White, Camile (Self)

 Against :

 Griffin, Roy (Self)

 McGovern, Katherine (Self)

 Stevens, Shawn (Self; Democratic Party of Collin County)

 Registering, but not testifying:

 For :

 Anderson, Ida (Self)

 Atkins, Vera (Self)

 Galloway, Bruce (Self)

 Galloway, Carolyn (Self)

 1

 WITNESS LIST

 HB 2 

 HOUSE COMMITTEE REPORT

 Redistricting, Select Committee

 Johnson, Gwen (Self)

 Lee, Opal (Self)

 Lewis, Rosie D. (Rosa) (Self)

 Napier, Tina (Self)

 Narvaez, Omar (Self; Stonewall Dallas)

 Warren, Mary (Self)

 Against :

 Blackwell, Tom (Self)

 Martinez, Pedro (Self)

 Richardson, Pat (Self)

 Strater, Jeff (Self)

 Tovar, Dora (Self)

 On :

 Harless, Barbara (Self)

 June 10, 2013 - 2:00 PM 

 Against :

 Cadena, Eli (Self)

 Gonzalez y Menchaca, Sher (Self)

 Korbel, George (LULAC National)

 Registering, but not testifying:

 For :

 Sands, Kara (Self; Hispanic Republicans of Nueces County)

 June 12, 2013 - 2:00 PM 

 Against :

 Blavier, Rhys (Self)

 Lockett, Joseph (Self)

 Longhofer, Kyle I (Self)

 Moffitt, Jill (Self)

 Registering, but not testifying:

 For :

 Presley, Louise (Self)

 Tijerina, Joseph (Precinct Chair 0026: Harris County)

 Against :

 Ashley, Larry (Self)

 Brown, Vicki (Self)

 Hailey, Mary (Self)

 Sterling, SJ (Self)

 Williams, Daniel (Equality Texas)

 2