Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1016 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2015

                    By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1016
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 5, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of certain river or stream segments as
 being of unique ecological value.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "Region L" means
 Regional Water Planning Area L designated in accordance with
 Section 16.053, Water Code, as the area's boundaries existed on
 September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  DESIGNATION OF RIVER OR STREAM SEGMENTS OF
 UNIQUE ECOLOGICAL VALUE. The legislature, as authorized by Section
 16.051(f), Water Code, designates as being of unique ecological
 value the following river or stream segments:
 (1)  the Nueces River from the northern boundary of
 Region L to United States Geological Survey gauge number 08190000;
 (2)  the Frio River from the northern boundary of
 Region L to United States Geological Survey gauge number 08195000;
 (3)  the Sabinal River from the northern boundary of
 Region L to its intersection with State Highway 187;
 (4)  the San Marcos River from a point 0.4 miles
 upstream from its intersection with State Highway Loop 82 to its
 intersection with Interstate Highway 35; and
 (5)  the Comal River from its intersection with East
 Klingemann Street in New Braunfels to its confluence with the
 Guadalupe River.
 SECTION 3.  EFFECT OF DESIGNATION. The designation of a
 river or stream segment as being of unique ecological value under
 Section 2 of this Act:
 (1)  means only that a state agency or political
 subdivision of the state may not finance the actual construction of
 a reservoir in the designated segment;
 (2)  does not affect the ability of a state agency or
 political subdivision of the state to construct, operate, maintain,
 or replace a weir, a water diversion, flood control, drainage, or
 water supply system, a low water crossing, or a recreational
 facility in the designated segment;
 (3)  does not prohibit the permitting, financing,
 construction, operation, maintenance, or replacement of any water
 management strategy to meet projected water supply needs
 recommended in, or designated as an alternative in, the 2011 or 2016
 Regional Water Plan for Region L; and
 (4)  does not alter any existing property right of an
 affected landowner.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2015.
 * * * * *